Financial history MONMOUTHSHIRE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 1013482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £18.12k £16.24k £19.29k £41.63k £8.86k
Total expenditure £16.21k £22.20k £30.29k £8.15k £16.77k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £36.63k N/A