Trustees MONMOUTHSHIRE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 1013482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elliot Smart Chair 26 November 2020
None on record
Edward Freddy Morgan Trustee 06 September 2022
None on record
Linda Revill Trustee 01 February 2022
None on record
Alex Hawkins Trustee 19 October 2021
None on record
Bethanie Kate Headworth Trustee 17 June 2021
None on record
Lee Philpot Trustee 26 November 2020
None on record
Madeline Patricia Quick Trustee 26 November 2020
None on record
Dorothy Ann Munslow Trustee 05 June 2018
None on record
Richard Baker Trustee 05 June 2018
None on record
CHRIS MUNSLOW Trustee 15 June 2016
None on record
Richard Quick Trustee 15 June 2016
None on record
Deborah Bainbridge Trustee 31 May 2015
MIRUS - WALES
Received: On time
Patricia Hillman Trustee 31 May 2010
None on record