SIR PIERCE LACY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1013505
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To apply the annual income for such charitable purposes for the benefit of The Roman Catholic Church or any institution associated therewith as the trustees in their absolute discretion may determine provided always that so far as it is practicable to do so such charitable purposes shall be selected from those to which payments shall have been made during the lifetime of Sir Pierce Lacy.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 23 March 2024

Total income: £15,539
Total expenditure: £27,843

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for being a trustee.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 August 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Apex Corporate Trustees (UK) Limited Trustee 25 March 2013
SIR ROBERT SPEED CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
C J AND E J MELBOURNE TRUST
Received: On time
THE VALERIE NICHOLS MEMORIAL PRIZE TRUST
Received: On time
NERSES GULBENKIAN FUND FOR THE ARMENIAN CHURCH, KADIKAY, ISTANBUL
Received: On time
CHARLES HORACE WILKINSON TRUST
Received: On time
NERSES GULBENKIAN 1947 VOLUNTARY SETTLEMENT
Received: On time
THE VIVIEN WILSON CHARITY FUND
Received: On time
NERSES GULBENKIAN
Received: On time
THOMAS MILLS SETTLEMENT IN CONNECTION WITH LYDD SUNDAY SCHOOL
Received: On time
MISS BARBARA MARY WILMOT DISCRETIONARY TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 23/03/2020 23/03/2021 23/03/2022 23/03/2023 23/03/2024
Total gross income £22.27k £14.88k £14.69k £15.79k £15.54k
Total expenditure £41.83k £28.87k £11.03k £45.92k £27.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 23 March 2024 16 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 23 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 23 March 2023 22 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 23 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 23 March 2022 16 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 23 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 23 March 2021 24 January 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 23 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 23 March 2020 01 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 23 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Apex Corporate Trustees (UK) Ltd
4th Floor
140 Aldersgate Street
London
EC1A 4HY
Phone:
02033947200
Website:

No information available