Financial history ST NICHOLAS AT WADE PARENT, TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1013544
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 01/09/2018 01/09/2019 01/09/2020 01/09/2021
Total gross income £8.24k £14.81k £14.22k £6.68k £5.71k
Total expenditure £6.09k £13.31k £15.03k £4.83k £13.20k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £260 N/A N/A