THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND RECORD SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society was founded with the object of promoting interest in and knowledge of the history of the Church of England from the sixteenth century onwards. The Society aims to do this through an annual lecture and by publishing primary material of significance for the history of the Church of England, whether in the form of letters, diaries, treatises, visitation articles, or other documents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 August 1992: Standard registration
- C O E R S (Working name)
- COERS (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Alexander Gray Ryrie | Chair | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr David James Crankshaw | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Harriet Katharine Lyon | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rebecca Jane Warren | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jacqueline Rose | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joshua Maxwell Redford Bennett | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Very Rev Dr David Michael Hoyle | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Byford | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Professor Hilary Mary Carey | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gareth Atkins | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anne Margaret Stott | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Grimley | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.14k | £15.98k | £9.73k | £11.38k | £11.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.52k | £15.15k | £810 | £13.09k | £5.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16TH DECEMBER 1991 as amended on 06 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF THE CHURCH IN ENGLAND, AND IN PARTICULAR OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND, FROM THE SIXTEENTH CENTURY ONWARDS BY THE PUBLICATION OF PRIMARY SOURCES OF INFORMATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MERTON COLLEGE
MERTON STREET
OXFORD
OX1 4JD
- Phone:
- 02083319919
- Email:
- coerstreasurer@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window