Financial history MERCURY PHOENIX TRUST

Charity number: 1013768
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £481.60k £411.99k £768.24k £1.14m £737.12k
Total expenditure £477.23k £397.48k £486.52k £675.43k £353.10k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £662.35k £1.00m £710.88k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £104.33k £133.47k £24.08k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £1.56k £4.66k £2.16k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £433.50k £616.15k £332.00k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £53.02k £59.28k £21.11k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £1.52k £2.70k £1.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £581.63k £270.71k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0