Trustees 1ST ASHCOMBE (WESTON-SUPER-MARE) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1013788
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL GREEN Trustee 19 November 2019
None on record
Keith Alder Trustee 28 June 2016
None on record
Brian Poole Trustee 27 September 2014
None on record
Diane Biddulph Trustee 27 September 2014
None on record
Suzanne Brimble Trustee 27 September 2014
None on record
Andrew Lee Trustee 27 August 2014
None on record
Duncan Biddulph Trustee 27 September 2013
NORTH TAUNTON SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time