THE CARIBBEAN ELDERLY HAIROUN DAY CENTRE

Charity number: 1013824
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £61.03k £56.22k £52.22k £38.77k £49.86k
Total expenditure £67.36k £70.93k £70.73k £66.77k £60.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £10.23k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.52k £7.52k £7.52k £7.52k £20.38k