Trustees HOPE NOT HATE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1013880
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gurinder Singh Josan CBE Chair 09 December 2014
None on record
Alex Chambers Trustee 14 March 2022
None on record
Anna Turley Trustee 30 January 2022
None on record
David Russel Lerner Trustee 28 January 2022
None on record
Imam Qari Asim MBE Trustee 05 February 2018
None on record
Ros Wynne-Jones Trustee 05 February 2018
None on record
Rabbi Dr Harvey BELOVSKI Trustee 11 July 2016
None on record
Simon Tuttle Trustee 09 December 2014
THE LONDON PATHWAY
Received: On time
Peter ADAMS Trustee 16 June 2011
None on record