THE E H C M CHARITABLE TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Awards mainly given to String Students (Violin, Viola & Cello) to further their studies in chamber music. The Emanuel Hurwitz string prize of -ú500.00 and The Emanuel Hurwitz Post Graduate Violin Prize (new this year) for a violinist to study at the Royal Academy of Music. Travel grants given to students to enable them to take up a place at Tanglewood, Aspen, Bannf owhich must be a full scholarshi
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 July 2017
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Llundain Fwyaf
Llywodraethu
- 04 Medi 1992: Cofrestrwyd
- 11 Rhagfyr 2018: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £1.37k | £1.99k | £400 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £4.12k | £9.68k | £10.24k | £0 | £360 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Gorffennaf 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Gorffennaf 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Gorffennaf 2017 | 28 Chwefror 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Gorffennaf 2017 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Gorffennaf 2016 | 03 Mawrth 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Gorffennaf 2016 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Gorffennaf 2015 | 03 Ionawr 2016 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Gorffennaf 2015 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 25TH JULY 1992
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC, PARTICULARLY CHAMBER MUSIC BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND IN ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS:- 1.IN AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS EXHIBITIONS BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TENABLE TO PERSONS OF ANY AGE WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE THEM TO FURTHER THEIR MUSICAL EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR IN THE FIELD OF CHAMBER MUSIC 2.IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE OUTFITS CLOTHING TOOLS INSTRUMENTS MUSIC OR BOOKS TO SUCH PERSONS TO PREPARE THEM FOR OR ASSIST THEIR ENTRY INTO THE MUSIC PROFESSION OR SERVICE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window