Accounts and annual returns THE CHAPELS SOCIETY

Charity number: 1014207
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required