Trustees THE CHAPELS SOCIETY

Charity number: 1014207
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ian Serjeant Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Matthew Davis Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Dr William Mungo Jacob Trustee 06 July 2019
PADDINGTON DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
LINCOLN THEOLOGICAL INSTITUTE FOR THE STUDY OF RELIGION AND SOCIETY
Received: 119 days late
THE HOLLAND LECTURESHIP
Received: On time
THE SOCIETY OF THE FAITH (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
Roger Holden Trustee 06 July 2019
None on record
Dr Gerard Timothy John Charmley Trustee 06 July 2019
None on record
Dr Edward Royle Trustee 06 July 2019
None on record
Dr Caitriona Mary Seonaid McCartney Trustee 06 July 2019
None on record
Dr Kate Tiller Trustee 07 July 2018
THE OXFORDSHIRE RECORD SOCIETY
Received: On time
John Harrison Anderson Trustee 07 July 2018
None on record
JOHN GEORGE ELLIS Trustee 10 May 2018
ALLIANCE HOUSE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
KENT WORKPLACE MISSION
Received: On time
THE CONGREGATIONAL MEMORIAL HALL TRUST
Received: On time
WESTMINSTER COLLEGE CAMBRIDGE
Received: On time
THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH HISTORY SOCIETY
Received: On time
Rev Martin Wellings Trustee 16 July 2016
WESLEY MEMORIAL OXFORD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: 19 days late
THE HISTORIC CHAPELS TRUST
Received: On time