ASHBOURNE AND DISTRICT ANIMAL WELFARE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1014249
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 27 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 30 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 07 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 07 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 28 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 28 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 02 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 02 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 14 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 14 June 2017 On time Download