ASHBOURNE AND DISTRICT ANIMAL WELFARE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1014249
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £273.97k £281.15k £284.08k £288.03k £398.10k
Total expenditure £236.86k £293.57k £297.72k £304.56k £296.63k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £7.03k