FRIENDS OF LAKESIDE PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FoLPS raises funds to help Lakeside Nursery & Primary Academy provide services to its pupils that could not ordinarily be met from the school budget. It also funds, in part or in whole, improvements to the fabric of the school that could not ordinarily met from the school budget.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 18 September 1992: Standard registration
- F O L P S (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF LAKESIDE PRIMARY SCHOOLS (FOLPS) (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF LAKESIDE SCHOOLS (FOLS) (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAM ARMSTRONG | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
JENNY IRONS | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.74k | £10.41k | £8.33k | £18.52k | £17.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.63k | £5.57k | £3.29k | £10.12k | £20.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 03 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 6TH OF APRIL 1992 AS AMENDED ON THE 30TH SEPTEMBER 1998. as amended on 27 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN BOTH LAKESIDE COUNTY AND MIDDLE SCHOOLS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lakeside Nursery & Primary Academy
Mindenhurst Road
Deepcut
CAMBERLEY
Surrey
GU16 6LG
- Phone:
- 01276 469200
- Email:
- folps@lakeside.kite.academy
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window