Trustees ASSOCIATION FOR THE STUDY OF MODERN AND CONTEMPORARY FRANCE
Charity number: 1014382
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR CHRISTOPHER TINKER | Chair | 14 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jordan Owen McCullough | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cecile Guigui | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Steele | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Davis | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Dubillot | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Megan Ison | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Ruth McKelvey | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Andrew O'Neill | Trustee | 08 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicole Fayard | Trustee | 08 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Dr FIONA BARCLAY | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr AUDE CAMPMAS | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR JANICE WINDEBANK | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
PROF DAVID HANLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR MAIRE FEDELMA CROSS BA MA PHD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Steve Wharton | Trustee |
|
||||||
PROFESSOR SIAN REYNOLDS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.