WEST BARNES SINGERS

Charity number: 1014531
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 08 July 2020 26 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 08 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 08 July 2019 30 June 2020 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 08 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 08 July 2018 08 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 08 July 2018 08 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 08 July 2017 08 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 08 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 08 July 2016 14 May 2017 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 08 July 2016 Not Required