HASTINGS BADGER PROTECTION SOCIETY

Charity number: 1014678
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £95.31k £355 £376 £201 £170
Total expenditure £7.27k £7.36k £15.48k £4.58k £6.25k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A