Accounts and annual returns CHRISTIAN SCIENCE SOCIETY, TORBAY

Charity Number: 1014750
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2014 18 February 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2013 19 February 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2012 07 February 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2012 Not Required