Trustees NEWBRIDGE PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1014793

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ashley Purves | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Emma Pollard | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Robert Clews | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Ellen Osborn | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Kathy Runacres | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Brownell | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Evans | Trustee | 11 June 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.