ST VINCENT'S CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1014889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anthony Joseph Corish Trustee 15 June 2021 None on record
Gail Williams Trustee 18 February 2020 None on record
Fergal Davern Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Katie Frances O'Brien Trustee 04 December 2018 None on record
Robert Christopher Horsburgh Trustee 04 December 2018 None on record
Fr John Patrick Deehan Chair 28 April 2016
IRISH CHAPLAINCY Received: On time
Jacqueline Ann Redrup Trustee 04 December 2018 None on record
Dr Devkishan Vinay Chauhan Trustee 17 September 2019 None on record
Patricia Kathleen Black Trustee 28 April 2016 None on record
Kathleen Fox Trustee 04 December 2018
THE DAUGHTERS OF CHARITY OF ST VINCENT DE PAUL Received: On time
MARILLAC NEUROLOGICAL CARE CENTRE Received: On time
William Parisutham Trustee 04 December 2018 None on record
ALAN JOSEPH EDMONDSON Trustee None on record