RAJO Association

Charity number: 1014893
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 June 2021 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 October 2020 265 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 October 2020 630 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 October 2020 995 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 29 March 2017 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required