Trustees FRIENDS OF THE DEANERY C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1014938
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Adam Suter Chair 22 March 2022
None on record
Claire Hale Trustee 14 June 2022
None on record
Gemma Knight Trustee 22 March 2022
None on record
Alicia Peckett Trustee 22 March 2022
None on record
Katie Swann Trustee 22 March 2022
None on record
Jenny Wood Trustee 10 November 2020
None on record
Nicola Carter Trustee 10 November 2020
None on record
Kirsty Cullen Trustee 13 November 2018
None on record
Mark Green Trustee 13 November 2018
None on record
David Rooney Trustee 11 November 2014
None on record