Accounts and annual returns ST ANTHONY'S CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1014971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 21 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 15 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 15 September 2017 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required