Financial history ST ANTHONY'S CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1014971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £517 £5.63k £7.04k £3.30k £2.81k
Total expenditure £8.98k £1.47k £2.55k £10.36k £3.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A