CHRIST APOSTOLIC CHURCH WORLD SOUL WINNING AND EVANGELISTIC MINISTRY

Charity number: 1014992
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 February 2020 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 October 2019 349 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 15 October 2019 714 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1325 days
Annual return 31 December 2015 22 September 2017 326 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1690 days