BIRMINGHAM COUNCIL OF FAITHS

Charity number: 1015006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 31 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 27 April 2020 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 13 February 2020 319 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 25 May 2018 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 03 September 2016 29 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 03 September 2016 Not Required