BIRMINGHAM COUNCIL OF FAITHS

Charity number: 1015006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 03/09/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £1.79k £9.86k £5.58k £2.43k £1.71k
Total expenditure £1.15k £5.87k £6.88k £2.65k £1.70k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A