GILLIAN BULMER CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
At the trustees discretion the funds are used for charitable purposes or institutions in the county of Hereford. In particular the advancement of education in the field of social and economic history.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2020
Total income includes £317 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 04 November 1992: Standard registration
- 10 March 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 10 March 2020: Funds transferred to 1158061 HEREFORD CIDER MUSEUM TRUST
- PIPPIN TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/01/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.87k | £343.59k | £115.35k | £123.74k | £46.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.22k | £80.70k | £126.31k | £132.72k | £3.30m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £3.01k | £3.33k | £317 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 05 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 05 March 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 17 July 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 17 July 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 16 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 10 September 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 09 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 09 January 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12/10/1992 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 31/03/2015
Charitable objects
FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND TO MAKE DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE FOUNDER MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF TRUST DEED)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window