Financial history KESGRAVE CHURCH OF ENGLAND CHARITY

Charity number: 1015051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £24.61k £26.23k £12.50k £16.34k £62.85k
Total expenditure £32.23k £20.26k £11.49k £16.79k £18.26k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k £0 N/A N/A N/A