Trustees DOWNE HOUSE SCHOOL
Charity number: 1015059

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nick Woods | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally McNair Scott | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paola Diana | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Ross | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Boucher | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Clarke | Trustee | 29 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Clare Ratnage | Trustee | 29 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joseph smith | Trustee | 28 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARK KEOKI RIDLEY | Trustee | 29 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Lt Colonel Christopher O'Kane | Trustee | 19 November 2015 |
|
|||||
FIONA HOLMES | Trustee | 19 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Veryan Jane Exelby | Trustee | 25 September 2014 |
|
|||||
ANNE FRANCES HAZLITT | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.