LONDON CHRISTIAN FAMILY FAITH TABERNACLE

Charity number: 1015067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 November 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 November 2020 367 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2020 731 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 November 2017 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 31 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required