LONDON CHRISTIAN FAMILY FAITH TABERNACLE

Charity number: 1015067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £24.43k £24.09k £20.05k £16.50k £21.90k
Total expenditure £23.47k £24.40k £20.00k £17.00k £22.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A