HOLY AND NOBLE KORAN SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the recitation of the Holy Quran through providing specialist education and training for regular individuals, and for faith leaders via providing various courses in Quranic Arts to produce more Qari's, (Quranic Artists). Promoting interfaith harmony by organizing and taking part in global interfaith conferences. Poverty relief & providing religious advice to spread love, peace & unity!
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Lancashire
- Canada
- Pakistan
Governance
- 16 November 1992: Standard registration
- T H A N K S ALQUR'AAN THE HOLY QUR'AN (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Imam/Qari Ibrahim Hussain | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Imam/Qari Imtiaz Hussain | Trustee | 16 November 1992 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £750 | £1.70k | £2.60k | £1.90k | £3.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £700 | £1.70k | £2.10k | £1.70k | £3.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 03 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 17 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 OCTOBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Religious Advice Centre
145 Victoria Street
BLACKBURN
BB1 6DS
- Phone:
- 07798758170
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window