THE COAL INDUSTRY SOCIAL WELFARE ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1015581
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.28m £3.56m £9.14m £4.20m £2.99m
Total expenditure £4.24m £4.63m £4.18m £4.06m £3.60m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.86k £25.91k £96.51k £7.81k £3.35k
Income - Other trading activities £120.30k £122.00k £128.00k £130.50k £133.50k
Income - Charitable activities £1.92m £1.85m £1.17m £672.36k £629.57k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.20m £1.16m £1.18m £1.22m £956.00k
Income - Other £25.27k £395.60k £6.55m £2.17m £1.27m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £42.71k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.11m £4.50m £4.06m £3.95m £3.50m
Expenditure - Raising funds £132.52k £122.65k £115.82k £115.83k £107.46k
Expenditure - Governance £137.42k £82.86k £37.43k £36.14k £40.02k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £123.22k £122.65k £115.82k £115.83k £107.46k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0