THE COAL INDUSTRY SOCIAL WELFARE ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1015581
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 04 December 1992: Standard registration
  • 02 November 2012: Funds received from 520476 LOSCOE MINERS WELFARE INSTITUTE AND RECREATION GRO...
  • 01 May 2014: Funds received from 230532 PONTEFRACT MINERS' RECREATIONAL CHARITY
  • 04 December 2014: Funds received from 522173 ANNESLEY MINERS WELFARE TRUST
  • 17 January 2020: Funds received from 520417 BLACKWELL MINERS' WELFARE SCHEME
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • CISWO (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property