PINK TRIANGLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. the advancement of the education of the public, and particularly of lesbians and gay men, in the principles and practice of humanism; 2. the advancement of the education of the public, about all aspects of homosexuality; 3. the assistance of particular poor persons to obtain remedies under the law where they have suffered unlawful discrimination or injustice on account of either.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 December 1992: Standard registration
- P T T (Working name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hugo Daniel Estrella | Trustee | 20 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Hartill | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
George Stephen Harvie | Trustee | 25 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MARSHALL | Trustee | 07 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL PAUL JONES | Trustee | 02 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
DEAN BRAITHWAITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER THOMAS LACEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.24k | £4.74k | £4.87k | £4.93k | £5.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.91k | £5.89k | £4.68k | £2.68k | £7.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 June 2024 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 11 July 2023 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 20 June 2023 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 June 2022 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 16 January 2022 | 230 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 29 October 2021 | 151 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 16 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 29 October 2021 | 516 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30 APRIL 1992 AS AMENDED 27 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
1.THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC,AND PARTICULARLY OF LESBIANS AND GAY MEN,IN THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF HUMANISM.2.THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC,AND PARTICULARLY HUMANISTS ABOUT ALL ASPECTS OF HOMOSEXUALITY.3.THE ASSISTANCE OF INDIVIDUAL POOR PERSONS TO OBTAIN REMEDIES UNDER THE LAW WHERE THEY HAVE SUFFERED UNLAWFUL DISCRIMINATION OR INJUSTICE ON ACCOUNT OF THEIR HOMOSEXUALITY OR THEIR HUMANISM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pink Triangle Trust
George Court
6 Bartholemew's Walk
ELY
Cambridgeshire
CB7 4JW
- Phone:
- 07910 072196
- Email:
- PinkTriangleTrust@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window