VANDYKE ROAD PLAYGROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to enhance the development and education of children under statutory school age by encouraging parents to understand and provide for the needs of their children through community groups and by offering appropriate play facilities and traing courses..regardless of race culture religion or means; furthering the aim of the Pre School Play Groups Association, in Leighton Buzzard, Beds
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 17 December 1992: Standard registration
- 17 September 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.53k | £71.58k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.30k | £85.82k | £901 | £158 | £159 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £81.08k | £59.83k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 OCTOBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY:-(A)OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN, REGARDLESS OF RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION OR MEANS. (B)ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS. (C)INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIM OF THE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUPS ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE LEIGHTON BUZZARD, BEDFORDSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window