MALMESBURY RIVER VALLEYS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve, conserve, and protect land owned by the trust, its terrestrial and aquatic life and their habitats for the benefit of the public. To advance public education in the study of and research into the river valleys and their conservation. Conygre Mead is a designated nature reserve and a County Wildlife Site.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 17 December 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven John Phelps | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Nigel Burns | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Gould | Trustee | 12 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Louis Kyte | Trustee | 08 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Davies | Trustee | 13 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
RUSSELL WILSON | Trustee | 08 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Deacon | Trustee | 19 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER MALCOLM BOYMAN HOWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LESLEY CLARE STOCKMAN BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FRANCES ANN GOLDSTONE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MP PAUL JOHN DARBY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.33k | £1.90k | £7.87k | £5.15k | £81.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.02k | £6.30k | £1.65k | £5.87k | £12.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2024
(These accounts |
22 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 DECEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
1) TO PRESERVE CONSERVE AND PROTECT CONYGRE MEAD AND ANY OTHER LAND ACQUIRED BY THE TRUST ITS TERRESTRIAL AND AQUATIC LIFE AND THEIR HABITATS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC 2) TO PROVIDE ON SUCH LAND APPROPRIATE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID PUBLIC 3) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION INTHE STUDY OF AND RESEARCH INTO MALMESBURYS RIVER VALLEYS AND ITS CONSERVATION AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE MALMESBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Kings Wall
Malmesbury
SN16 9BJ
- Phone:
- 07771 707827
- Email:
- jim@burns.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window