Friends Of St Andrews CofE Primary Academy (Chardstock)

Charity number: 1015877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 October 2020 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 12 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 28 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required