RAYMOND WILLIAMS MEMORIAL TRUST SOCIETY

Charity number: 1015887
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £2.12k £1.84k £1.83k £1.49k £2.01k
Total expenditure £2.11k £1.26k £1.46k £1.28k £2.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A