Accounts and annual returns INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR THE STUDY OF HYPERTENSION IN PREGNANCY

Charity number: 1015890
Charity reporting is overdue by 1614 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 153 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 153 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 518 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 518 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 883 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 883 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1249 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1249 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1614 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1614 days