SOCIETY OF ACADEMIC & RESEARCH SURGERY

Charity number: 1015921
Charity reporting is up to date (48 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 December 2020 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 17 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 01 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 26 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 18 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 27 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 23 September 2016 On time Download