SOCIETY OF ACADEMIC & RESEARCH SURGERY

Charity number: 1015921
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LORNA MARSON Trustee 19 January 2017 None on record
PROF STEVE WHITE Trustee 01 November 2012 None on record
Dr Tracey Amanda Martin-Harrison Trustee 08 June 2020 None on record
Prof. Dileep Lobo Trustee 08 January 2019 None on record
Prof. Daryll Baker Trustee 08 June 2020 None on record
DR RACHEL HARGEST MD FRCS Trustee 19 January 2017 None on record
Dr Sivesh Kamarajah Trustee 08 June 2020 None on record
Prof Tim Underwood Trustee 11 January 2018 None on record
Dr Joseph Shalhoub Trustee 08 June 2020 None on record