THE OAKDALE JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1015931
Charity reporting is 249 days late
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 Not yet received
249 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not yet received
249 days overdue
Annual return 31 August 2018 18 October 2019 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 16 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 07 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2015 10 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)