THE OAKDALE JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1015931
Charity reporting is up to date (276 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £6.62k £6.63k £10.99k £19.62k £17.00k
Total expenditure £6.87k £2.72k £6.85k £8.69k £19.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A