FRIENDS OF IVY BANK

Charity number: 1015967
Charity reporting is overdue by 32 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 32 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 32 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 04 January 2020 188 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 14 September 2018 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 06 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required