FRIENDS OF IVY BANK

Charity number: 1015967
Charity reporting is overdue by 27 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £7.01k £8.48k £8.81k £9.52k £10.22k
Total expenditure £3.74k £4.91k £7.43k £9.03k £10.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A