THE NORTH LONDON YOUTH SAILING TRUST

Charity number: 1015997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 20 February 2017 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required