Financial history KINGTON ST MICHAEL WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1016260
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £6.36k £4.64k £4.24k £1.76k £2.28k
Total expenditure £6.80k £4.32k £4.33k £1.78k £2.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A